U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.