U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 12, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.