U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clinding
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 31, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • October 31, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 16, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.