U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Document]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - First Step Act]
  • December 29, 2022: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 09, 2022: [2255 Letter]
  • December 09, 2022: [Vacate (2255) ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 10, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2021: [Competency Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Seal ]
  • July 01, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 10, 2021: [Seal ]
  • May 10, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 06, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.