U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garrett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 12, 2022: [Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 19, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • May 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 15, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 01, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for evidence under Rule 404(b)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Suppress ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 12, 2021: [Brady Materials]
  • December 12, 2021: [404(b) Evidence]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 10, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.