U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHACKLEFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 17, 2021: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • September 17, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 15, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • September 14, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.