U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Furley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 07, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.