U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mencias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Service by Publication]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.