U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez Barahona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.