U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [USMS Return of Service]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [USMS Return of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 10, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.