U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Vacate ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 06, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.