U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kylestewa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice-other]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 28, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 25, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • October 25, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 11, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 12, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.