U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Huinil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • April 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 20, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.