U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 14, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 13, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 06, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.