U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Page
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Document]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.