U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cowan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 29, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.