U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stokley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • April 14, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.