U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 28, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 13, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.