U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Service by Publication]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 08, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.