U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.