U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00198-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harmon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.