U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poteat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 21, 2025: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • May 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.