U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cerasaro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arrest]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.