U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Everett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2022: [Text Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 03, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.