U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:02-cr-00267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WORKMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice-Other]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 14, 2021: [Garnishment]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
  • August 11, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • July 13, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Application for Writ by USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.