U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 26, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • August 25, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.