U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Service by Publication]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 09, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.