U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice Regarding Passport]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • October 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 02, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 31, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.