U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: [Screening Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.