U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drayton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 15, 2021: [Claim]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • September 23, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 23, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.