U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Floyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 20, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 20, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Service by Publication]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.