U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Randall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Service by Publication]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 05, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • November 05, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • November 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue Other]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue Other]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Victim Rights]
  • June 15, 2021: [Victim Rights]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.