U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yambo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 09, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.