U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 11, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Request for Notice of Alibi/Insanity Defense]
  • January 27, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [Suppress]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.