U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mummert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 29, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.