U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.