U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 28, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • May 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.