U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coulter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Service by Publication]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.