U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Polk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Service by Publication]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.