U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.