U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Suppress]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.