U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steptoe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response - other]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Indictment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.