U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [Service by Publication]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.