U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leonard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order - Other - USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 12, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • July 26, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 18, 2021: [Demand for Alibi Witness]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 01, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.