U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Document]
  • March 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 26, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 25, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.