U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PANNELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • October 03, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • August 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 08, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Probation Petition/Order-Summons]
  • September 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • September 27, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • September 27, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.