U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bulluck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 27, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.