U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 02, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 23, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • May 27, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.