U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prentice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.