U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Reduce Sentence ]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • May 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.